Heathcote, John Godfrey (CPSO#: 53315)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 55 Granite Cove Drive Hubley, NS B3Z 1A1
Date Received: 04 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016