Heaton, Kenneth John Stephen (CPSO#: 52400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1984

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
423 Devonshire Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 5P5
Phone: (519) 537-8303
Fax: (519) 539-3838
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth J.S. Heaton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Heaton ( CPSO# 52400 )

Business Address:
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A1
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
Suite 301
423 Devonshire Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 5P5
Phone Number: (519) 537-8303

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 5, 2010
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 14, 2010, Woodstock General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Kenneth John Stephen Heaton's privileges were restricted, effective July 5, 2010 to January 24, 2011.

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH JOHN STEPHEN HEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEATON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1984