Heavens, Jason Pernell (CPSO#: 71580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Healtcare North Hastings
1 H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone: (613) 332-2825
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason P. Heavens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Heavens ( CPSO# 71580 )
Dr. P. McEnery ( CPSO# 25616 )

Business Address:
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings
1 H Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Business Address:
3 Cleak Avenue
Bancroft ON  K0A 1C0

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street, Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 11 Feb 2011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON PERNELL HEAVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEAVENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1999