Hebb, Alan Ralph (CPSO#: 20588)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Maple Villa Long Term Care Centre, 441 Maple Avenue, Burlington, ON L7S 1L8
Date Received: 04 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015