Hebert, Guy Joseph (CPSO#: 62218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 14347
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4347
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Hebert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hebert ( CPSO# 62218 )
Dr. C. Gerin-Lajoie ( CPSO# 69012 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4773

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUY JOSEPH HEBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEBERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1991