Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hebert, Paul Clarence (CPSO#: 57249)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2017