Heckman, George Albert Winston (CPSO#: 69138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Research Institute for Aging
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2J 0E2
Phone: (519) 904-0660 Ext. 4200
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: 519-744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

The Village at University Gates
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2J 0E2
Canada
Phone: (519) 904-0650
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Canada
Phone: (519) 578-3510
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE ALBERT WINSTON HECKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HECKMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 08 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999