Heddle, Stewart Balfour (CPSO#: 22611)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 2, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective September 2, 2011, Dr. Heddle has voluntarily resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.