Hedges, Kenneth Hurrell (CPSO#: 27761)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 16 Oct 2009

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010