Heeney, Rebecca Catherine (CPSO#: 113929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Family Physicians
594 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5K9
Phone: 5198423636
Fax: 5198429522
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tillsonburg District Memorial Hosp
167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Maple Manor Nursing Home
73 Bidwell St
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3T8
Canada
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Heeney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Heeney ( CPSO# 113929)

Business Address:
Tillsonburg Family Physicians
594 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5K9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3636

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Business Address:
73 Bidwell Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3T8
Phone Number: (519) 842-3563

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA CATHERINE HEENEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEENEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2018