Hegde, Anand Purushotnam (CPSO#: 22992)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of London, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2007