Hegde, Shivaram (CPSO#: 78882)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Gulbarga University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2003 to 08 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 09 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 28 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2004