Hegele, Richard George (CPSO#: 53915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Dept Paediatric Laboratory Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5970
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michael's Hospital
Dept Pathology& Laboratory Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Fax: (416) 864-5648
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD GEORGE HEGELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGELE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985