Heid, Robert Dieter (CPSO#: 64045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 5038
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Heid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Heid ( CPSO# 64045 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DIETER HEID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1993