Heidarpour Meymeh, Reza (CPSO#: 84979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46611
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Chronic Pain Clinic
Suite 101
500 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Canada
Phone: (705) 792-7890
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

The Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 792-0933
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heidarpour Meymeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Heidarpour Meymeh ( CPSO# 84979 )

Business Address:
500 Huronia Road
Suite 1
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Phone Number: (705) 792-7890

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 792-0933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REZA HEIDARPOUR MEYMEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEIDARPOUR MEYMEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008