Heidman, Jaimi Gray (CPSO#: 98286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

170-201 SImcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Canada
Phone: 705 742 0783
Fax: 705 742 1744
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Scott James and Jaimi Gray Heidman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Heidman ( CPSO# 98285 )
Dr. J. Heidman ( CPSO# 98286 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Suite 201
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone Number: (705) 742-0783

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAIMI GRAY HEIDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEIDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 30 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016