Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Heier, Krista Jane (CPSO#: 68753)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014