Heike, Catherine Ann Michiko (CPSO#: 60717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
1407 Yonge St.
Toronto ON  M4T 1Y7
Phone: (416) 923-9653
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANN MICHIKO HEIKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEIKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990