Heinrich, Lee Ellis (CPSO#: 71991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health
Care Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 985-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heinrich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Heinrich ( CPSO# 71991 )
Dr. S. Unger ( CPSO# 67928 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Healthcare Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 985-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE ELLIS HEINRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEINRICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Oct 1997 to 19 Nov 1997
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1998