Heinrichs, David Alan (CPSO#: 53044)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995