Heinzl, Richard Arthur (CPSO#: 58029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ARTHUR HEINZL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEINZL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988