Heisey, Ruth Emily (CPSO#: 57216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: Wallingford, Ruth Emily (used until: 13 Jul 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6244
Fax: (416) 323-7323
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heisey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Heisey ( CPSO# 57216 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Health Centre
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH EMILY HEISEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEISEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988