Heisler, Ryan Lawrence (CPSO#: 68185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 221
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 746-3944
Fax: (416) 746-9329
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 209
40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 3Y6
Canada
Phone: (416) 749-9444
Fax: (416) 749-9446
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan L. Heisler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Heisler ( CPSO# 68185 )

Business Address:
221 - 89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 746-3944

Business Address:
Suite 209
40 Westmore Drive
Toronto ON  M9V 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 749-9444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN LAWRENCE HEISLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEISLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999