Heisten, Gaellan (CPSO#: 22030)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: McIlmoyle, Gaellan (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 31 Aug 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 1988