Heitzner, John Daniel (CPSO#: 66692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MEDICAL CENTRE
430 The Boardwalk, Suite 201
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 749-7911
Fax: (519) 749-5644
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heitzner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Heitzner ( CPSO# 66692 )

Business Address:
Medical Centre
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 201
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 749-7911

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador
Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DANIEL HEITZNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEITZNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997