Hejja, Paul (CPSO#: 26091)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 15229 E Palisades Boulevard Fountain Hills, AZ 85268-4370
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Dec 1989 to 20 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015