Hekkenberg, Robert John (CPSO#: 65209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 726-6900
Fax: (705) 725-7330
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

480 huronia road Ste 207
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 726-6900
Fax: (705) 725-7330
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Hekkenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hekkenberg ( CPSO# 65209 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 726-6900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN HEKKENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEKKENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993