Helewa, Ramzi Michael (CPSO#: 97294)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital, 501 Smyth Road, Ottawa, ON, K1H 8L6
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2012 to 04 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2012 to 14 Nov 2012
Elective Trainee - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016