Heller, Barbara Susan (CPSO#: 63820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
200 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone: (905) 526-6829
Fax: (905) 526-6230
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA SUSAN HELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000