Heller, Mariel Kupfert (CPSO#: 90965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Z3
Phone: (416) 636-2203
Fax: (647) 689-2199
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Adolescent Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIEL KUPFERT HELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2014