Heller, Martin (CPSO#: 32700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 400
Downsview ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 746-7442
Fax: (416) 746-3311
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Heller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Heller ( CPSO# 32700 )

Business Address:
400 - 2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 746-7442

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN HELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984