Hellmann, Jonathan (CPSO#: 53539)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Ave Toronto, ON M5G 1X8 Tel: 416-813-1500
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 23 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018