Hellyer, Deborah Jean (CPSO#: 50702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Health Care
Suite A C 1420
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5111 Ext. 72344
Fax: (519) 257-5179
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Occupational Health Clinics
for Ontario Workers (OHCOW)
3129 Marentette Unit 1
Windsor ON  N8X 4G1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4800
Fax: (519) 973-1906
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Hellyer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hellyer ( CPSO# 50702 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Western Campus
A C 3417 - 1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH JEAN HELLYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELLYER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1984