Helou, Joe (CPSO#: 70002)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 8 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999