Helou, Joelle Antoine (CPSO#: 101687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  15 Sep 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:St. Joseph's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-4483
Fax: 416-946-6561
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 16 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Sep 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Joelle Antoine Helou may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Radiation
                        Oncology,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Helou holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires seven  years  from
                  the date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Helou no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr. Helou's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Helou's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on September 16, 2016.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 15, 2023.