Helyar, Richard Geoffrey (CPSO#: 70202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone: (519) 827-1399
Fax: (519) 827-1858
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Richard Helyar and Stella R. Pasion Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Helyar ( CPSO# 70202 )
Dr. S. Pasion ( CPSO# 71223 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 827-1399

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD GEOFFREY HELYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELYAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1998