Hemmett, Ioulia (CPSO#: 100837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Iosfina, Ioulia (used until: 13 May 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Nephrology
Room A2 337
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8524
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IOULIA HEMMETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMMETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015