Hemmings, Noel Stephen (CPSO#: 87538)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 17 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2007 to 01 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2007