Henbest, Ronald John (CPSO#: 42819)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1978 to 14 Jun 1979
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2006

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 11, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Ronald John Henbest to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Ronald John Henbest:

1). Having resigned from the College effective May 31, 2006, hereby undertake never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
2). Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
3). Acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with a discipline referral of allegations of professional misconduct, as set out in the Notice of Hearing dated May 17, 2007.
4). Agree that, in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, or attempted to apply for registration as a physician in Ontario, the College shall have the right to proceed with an investigation and disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the allegations referred to at paragraph 3.
6). Acknowledge that this Undertaking is irrevocable.