Henderson, Cynthia Louise (CPSO#: 57156)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1996