Henderson, John Ashton Maither (CPSO#: 17223)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Mar 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011