Henderson, Julie Lyanne (CPSO#: 82770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
7th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6230
Fax: (416) 323-6356
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ctre for Addiction & Mental Health
Gender Identity Clinic
100 Stokes Street, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34447
Fax: 416 595 6821
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Patients followed with At Home TNSS
Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St E., 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416 775 3621
Fax: 416 640 2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE LYANNE HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010