Henderson, Larry Scott (CPSO#: 30448)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 02 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Other - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 03 May 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 03 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 31 May 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 28 Feb 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2009
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 02 Nov 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jul 2010
Summary:

 On July 19, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Larry Scott Henderson committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient. Dr. Henderson was 
 Patient A's family physician from 1985 until the fall of 2000. Beginning in April 1997 and 
 continuing during the time of the doctorpatient relationship, Dr. Henderson engaged in a sexual 
 relationship, including intercourse, with Patient A. 

On November 2, 2010, the Discipline 
 Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar revoke Dr. Henderson's certificate of 
 registration effective 11:59 p.m. on November 2, 2010.

2.	Dr. Henderson appear before the panel 
 to be reprimanded.

3.	Dr. Henderson reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under 
 the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or 
 other security acceptable to the College, by December 15, 2010, in the amount of $13,130.

4.	Dr. 
 Henderson pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,950 on November 2, 2010.

5.	The results 
 of this proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 14 through to Decembre 18, 2009


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Mar 2005
Summary:

 On March 24, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Henderson to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, sexual impropriety and 
 conduct that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The 
 Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. Henderson(s 
 certificate of registration for a period of nine (9) months commencing on May 31, 2005;

2.	Dr. 
 Henderson attend, at his own expense, and complete the College(s Ethics Course, prior to his 
 return to practice;

3.	Dr. Henderson appear before the Committee to be reprimanded; and

3.	The 
 results of this proceeding be included in the Register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 24, 2005


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Mar 2004
Summary:

 On March 10, 2004, Dr. Henderson admitted to and the Discipline Committee found that he committed 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in acts relevant to the practice of medicine that 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonuorable or unprofessional.  The College withdrew all other allegations.

The Discipline 
 Committee ordered and directed:

1.	The Registrar to suspend Dr. Henderson(s certificate of 
 registration for 3 months commencing May 3, 2004.

2.	The Registrar to impose a term, condition 
 and limitation on Dr. Henderson(s certificate of registration that Dr. Henderson successfully 
 complete the College(s Boundaries Course by November 2004, at his own expense, and provide proof 
 thereof to the Registrar.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 07, 2001