Henderson, Nadene Denise (CPSO#: 77132)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1) Weeneybayko General Hospital 480 Cassells St, North Bay ON P1B 3Z5 2) Kirkland District Hospital 145 Government Rd E Kirkland Lake, ON P2N 3P4 3) 2339 Dufferin Ave Toronto, ON M6E 4Z5
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017