Henderson, Robert John (CPSO#: 30473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Chung Dao 700 Main Street East Hamilton ON L8M 1K7
Date Received: 13 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN HENDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2017