Hendra, Rosemary Anne (CPSO#: 111845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2017

Expiry Date:  01 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GSH Medical
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone: (416) 789-2449
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 200
481 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1S9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2017 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Rosemary  Anne  Hendra  may  practise family medicine at the offices
                  located at 801 Eglinton Avenue West and 481 Bloor Street West in Toronto,
                  Ontario, while under supervision coordinated  by  a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  three  years  from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Hendra's knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Hendra's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on May 10, 2017 and currently has an  interim
                  expiry  date of November 1, 2018. The expiry date of this certificate may
                  be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.