Hendry, Graeme Andrew (CPSO#: 65646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
91 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 5L3
Phone: (613) 283-0710
Fax: (613) 283-9730
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Perth and Smiths Falls District
Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
Phone: (613) 283-2330
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graeme A. Hendry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hendry ( CPSO# 65646 )

Business Address:
91 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 5L3
Phone Number: (613) 283-2495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAEME ANDREW HENDRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992