Hendry, Paul Jonathan (CPSO#: 50706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Mar 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
725 Parkdale Ave
Loeb Building, Rm WM158
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 17628
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul J. Hendry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hendry ( CPSO# 50706 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
H3404B
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 224-3875

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JONATHAN HENDRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1989