Henis, Mohsen Shenouda Hanna (CPSO#: 78052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bonis-Birchmount Medical Clinic
5 Bonis Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1T 2T9
Phone: (416) 335-0077
Fax: (416) 335-9277
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Henis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Henis ( CPSO# 78052 )

Business Address:
Bonis-Birchmount Medical Clinic
5 Bonis Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1T 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 355-0077

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHSEN SHENOUDA HANNA HENIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2004