Henneberry-Fudge, John David (CPSO#: 95972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

267 MacNab Street North (back unit)
Hamilton ON  L8L 1K2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John David Henneberry-Fudge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Henneberry-Fudge ( CPSO# 95972 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Psychiatry
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID HENNEBERRY-FUDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENNEBERRY-FUDGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016